Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1378.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|