LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB325
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB325
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB325
Compare Versions
AB325 Chaptered October 1, 2015
AB325 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB325 Amended July 1, 2015
AB325 Amended May 28, 2015
AB325 Amended May 13, 2015
AB325 Amended April 16, 2015
AB325 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB325 Chaptered October 1, 2015
AB325 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB325 Amended July 1, 2015
AB325 Amended May 28, 2015
AB325 Amended May 13, 2015
AB325 Amended April 16, 2015
AB325 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare