|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3136.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2712.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1755.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|