|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1664.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|