California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015