|
07/14/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2015
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2015
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1550.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 975.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|