|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3211.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3211.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 3. Page 2737.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2759.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2715.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1925.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|