Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Read first time. To print. |