|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3076.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2616.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|