Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hall. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.) | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Read first time. To print. |