LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB355
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB355
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB355
Compare Versions
AB355 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB355 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB355 Amended August 19, 2015
AB355 Amended June 23, 2015
AB355 Amended May 26, 2015
AB355 Amended March 17, 2015
AB355 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB355 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB355 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB355 Amended August 19, 2015
AB355 Amended June 23, 2015
AB355 Amended May 26, 2015
AB355 Amended March 17, 2015
AB355 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare