Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Died on inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 1972.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Williams.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 33. Page 1927.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Williams.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|