Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Retained in suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Read first time. To print. |