California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill May 19, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015