|
07/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1614.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1101.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|