|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3087.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2617.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1768.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|