Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Read first time. To print. |