Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5485.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5065.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 1775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|