BILL NUMBER: AB 385AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 9, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chu ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Harper and Obernolte ) FEBRUARY 18, 2015 An act to add Section 6808 to the Government Code, and to repeal Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 of the Daylight Saving Time Act, an initiative measure approved at the November 8, 1949, special election, relating to Daylight Saving Time. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 385, as amended, Chu. Daylight Saving Time. Existing federal law establishes the standard time of the United States for each of 9 zones and advances the standard time of each zone by one hour during the period commencing at 2 a.m. on the 2nd Sunday of March of each year and ending at 2 a.m. on the first Sunday of November of each year. Existing state law, the Daylight Saving Time Act, which was adopted as an initiative measure by the voters at the November 8, 1949, special election, provides that the standard time within the state is that which is known, described, and designated by federal law as United States Standard Pacific Time. The act also requires, from 1 a.m. on the last Sunday of April, until 2 a.m. on the last Sunday of October, the standard time within the state to be one hour in advance of United States Standard Pacific Time. This bill would repeal the Daylight Saving TimeAct,Act and would require the standard time within the state to be that of the 5th zone designated by federal law as Pacific standard time. The bill would authorize the Legislature to amend its provisions by a majority vote tofurther the purposes of the bill.provide for the application of year-round day light savings time, if authorized by federal law. The California Constitution authorizes the Legislature to amend or repeal an initiative statute by another statute that becomes effective when approved by the electors. This bill would provide that it would become effective only upon approval of the voters. It would also provide for submission of this measure to the voters for approval at the next statewide general election. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6808 is added to the Government Code, to read: 6808. (a) The standard time within the state is that of the fifth zone designated by federal law as Pacific standard time (15 U.S.C. Secs. 261 and 263). (b)TheIf federal law authorizes the state to provide for the year-round application of the advancement of standard time commonly referred to as day light savings time, Legislature may amend this section by a majority vote tofurther the purposes of the act that added this section.provide for that application. SEC. 2. Section 1 of the Daylight Saving Time Act is repealed. SEC. 3. Section 2 of the Daylight Saving Time Act is repealed. SEC. 4. Section 3 of the Daylight Saving Time Act is repealed. SEC. 5. Section 4 of the Daylight Saving Time Act is repealed. SEC. 6. Section 5 of the Daylight Saving Time Act is repealed. SEC. 7. (a) Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, of this act amend the Daylight Saving Time Act, Proposition 12, an initiative statute approved by the voters at the November 8, 1949, special election, and shall become effective only when this act is submitted to and approved by the voters. The Secretary of State shall submit Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, of this act to the voters at a statewide election in accordance with Section 9040 of the Elections Code. (b) Upon approval of this act by the voters, the Secretary of State shall provide express notice to the federal Secretary of Transportation that California has, by law, exempted itself from provisions providing for the advancement of time, commonly referred to as daylight savings time.