LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB388
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB388
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB388
Compare Versions
AB388 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB388 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB388 Amended September 4, 2015
AB388 Amended August 20, 2015
AB388 Amended July 1, 2015
AB388 Amended April 22, 2015
AB388 Amended April 9, 2015
AB388 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB388 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB388 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB388 Amended September 4, 2015
AB388 Amended August 20, 2015
AB388 Amended July 1, 2015
AB388 Amended April 22, 2015
AB388 Amended April 9, 2015
AB388 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare