California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015