08/13/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 193, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/13/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/03/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1791.). | ||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 711.) | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 17). | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | ||
Assembly | 12/01/2014 | Read first time. To print. |