Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|