California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015