LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB403
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB403
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB403
Compare Versions
AB403 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB403 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB403 Amended September 4, 2015
AB403 Amended September 1, 2015
AB403 Amended July 16, 2015
AB403 Amended July 7, 2015
AB403 Amended June 1, 2015
AB403 Amended April 21, 2015
AB403 Amended March 26, 2015
AB403 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB403 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB403 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB403 Amended September 4, 2015
AB403 Amended September 1, 2015
AB403 Amended July 16, 2015
AB403 Amended July 7, 2015
AB403 Amended June 1, 2015
AB403 Amended April 21, 2015
AB403 Amended March 26, 2015
AB403 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare