LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB413
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB413
Compare Versions
AB413 Chaptered October 6, 2015
AB413 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB413 Amended June 30, 2015
AB413 Amended June 16, 2015
AB413 Amended May 7, 2015
AB413 Amended March 16, 2015
AB413 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB413 Chaptered October 6, 2015
AB413 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB413 Amended June 30, 2015
AB413 Amended June 16, 2015
AB413 Amended May 7, 2015
AB413 Amended March 16, 2015
AB413 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare