|
07/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1613.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1106.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1010.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|