Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Measure version as amended on April 13 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2015 | Read first time. To print. |