California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB429 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015