Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gray. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2015 | Read first time. To print. |