Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1803.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|