California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB437 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015