|
07/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1619.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|