LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB44
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB44
Compare Versions
AB44 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB44 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB44 Amended August 31, 2015
AB44 Amended June 24, 2015
AB44 Amended April 27, 2015
AB44 Amended April 8, 2015
AB44 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB44 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB44 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB44 Amended August 31, 2015
AB44 Amended June 24, 2015
AB44 Amended April 27, 2015
AB44 Amended April 8, 2015
AB44 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare