|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|