Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|