|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 432, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 6. Page 2769.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 2278.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 1906.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|