California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015