California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB45 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Amended

Bill January 21, 2016
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015