California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB450 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016