|
08/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2313.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1792.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 971.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|