Assembly | 01/05/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Read first time. To print. |