|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 5. Page 6426.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6225.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 5124.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Berryhill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held in committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 976.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|