Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1141.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|