|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 32. Page 2413.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1902.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 1430.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|