California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill May 9, 2016
Bill June 1, 2015