|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 30. Page 3086.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2484.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 1430.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|