California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015