California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015