California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 24, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015